IL SB3583 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for a grant to the Fox Waterway Agency to be used only for a revolving loan program to lend money to property owners for purposes of shoreline restoration and other waterway improvements. Effective July 1, 2010.
Title
$DNR-GRANT-FOX WATERWAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2010-02-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond |