IL SB3520 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health may designate a hospital as an Acute Stroke-Ready Hospital. Provides that a hospital that is certified as an Acute Stroke-Ready Hospital or Comprehensive Stroke Center by a nationally-recognized and Department-approved certifying body may be designated as such by the Department upon receipt of the certification and the payment of an annual fee. Provides that the fees collected for designation shall be used to support stroke care data collection and that any surplus funds from the fees shall be used to support the Department Stroke Coordinator's salary or for other stroke-care initiatives, including administrative oversight of stroke care. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Stroke Data Collection Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Deletes provisions regarding designation of hospitals as Emergent Stroke-Ready Hospitals. Contains procedures regarding Department designation of Acute Stroke-Ready Hospitals and Comprehensive Stroke Centers.
Title
EMS-STROKE CENTER DESIGNATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.117.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.117.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.118.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3520&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3520.htm |