IL SB3507 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common School Fund Article of the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning Tax Equivalent Grants.
Title
SCH CD-STUDENT-PANCREATIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-4.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |