IL SB3503 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each supervisor of assessments, assessor, deputy assessor, county treasurer, or member of a board of review must successfully complete a minimum of 15 hours of continuing education hours each year, except that board of review members in counties with more than 300,000 and less than 3,000,000 inhabitants must meet certain additional criteria. Provides that, at the annual meeting of supervisors of assessments, the supervisor shall instruct all assessors and their deputies in the type of software or other method of assessment that township assessors must use. Provides that the chief county assessment officer shall publish a list of all reduced assessments on the county's website. Provides that each notice of a final board of review action shall be postmarked (or e-mailed, if applicable) no later than 120 days after that final board of review action. Provides that, with respect to taxpayer complaints filed with the board of review, if the assessed value of the property for the year in question exceeds the assessed value of the property for the previous general assessment year by more than 5%, then the assessor or chief county assessment officer who certified the assessment has the burden of proving that the assessment is correct. Provides that the board of review may grant a continuance of any hearing before the board of review for good cause. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSORS-BD OF REVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-05-01 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 012-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 12-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 16-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 16-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 16-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 2-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 4-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 6-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 9-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 9-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |