IL SB3434 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides for the seizure and forfeiture of a watercraft used with the knowledge and consent of the owner in the commission of specified offenses. Provides for the seizure and forfeiture of a watercraft when a person operating the watercraft was (1) under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof under the Boat Registration and Safety Act during a period in which his or her privileges to operate a watercraft are revoked or suspended and the revocation or suspension was for operating a watercraft under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof; (2) operating a watercraft under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof and has been previously convicted of reckless homicide or a similar provision of a law in another state relating to reckless homicide in which the person was determined to have been under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof as an element of the offense or the person has previously been convicted of committing a violation of operating a watercraft under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof and was involved in an accident that resulted in death, great bodily harm, or permanent disability or disfigurement to another, when the violation was a proximate cause of the death or injuries; or (3) the person committed a violation of operating a watercraft under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds, or combination thereof under the Boat Registration and Safety Act or a similar provision for the third or subsequent time.
Title
CRIM CD-SEIZURE WATERCRAFT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0699 |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-027-000 |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 013-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-001 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 36-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36-1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |