IL SB3422 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois to provide that the Motor Sports Promotion Council Task Force may meet at the call of the Chair or any 4 members (instead of shall meet at least quarterly) and to repeal a Section concerning grants under the Gang Control Grant Act. Amends the Center for Business Ownership Succession and Employee Ownership Act to provide that a Center for Business Ownership Succession and Employee Ownership may be (instead of is) created within DCEO. Amends the Illinois Emergency Employment Development Act to provide that the Governor may (instead of shall) appoint an Illinois Emergency Employment Development Coordinator within DCEO. Repeals the Gang Control Grant Act. Amends the Board of Higher Education Act to provide that the Board and DCEO may (instead of shall) conduct an economic and educational feasibility study for the future development of Parks College in Cahokia, Illinois.
Title
DCEO-PERMISSIVE ADMIN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0995 | |
2010-07-02 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-02 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2010-03-15 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Commerce; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Commerce | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |