IL SB3416 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Services Act. Removes language requiring the Department of Human Services to establish a Family Support Services Voucher Pilot Program and instead requires the Department to coordinate and fund the Voucher Respite Program. Provides that the Voucher Respite Program shall be a subset of specified programs with the exception that administration of the Program shall not be limited to agencies that provide respite services. Provides that the purpose of the Program is to increase the number of families who are able to access respite services; provide families with greater flexibility over services; and prevent or delay the need for more intensive long-term care and support. Makes other conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
VOUCHER RESPITE PROGRAM
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 30 | 4.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3416&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3416.htm |