IL SB3389 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Legislative Ethics Commission shall adopt (rather than promulgate) rules under the Administrative Procedure Act governing (rather than rules governing) the performance of its duties and the exercise of its powers and governing the investigations of the Legislative Inspector General. Provides that the Commission shall adopt no rule requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation or issuing a subpoena. Provides that any existing rule, as of the effective date of the amendatory Act, requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation or issuing a subpoena is void. Removes language providing that the Legislative Inspector General needs the advance approval of the Commission to issue subpoenas. Provides that the Legislative Inspector General may publish a summary report for an investigation upon issuance of a final administrative decision that concludes that a violation occurred unless a supermajority of the Commission votes to suppress the report. Effective immediately.
Title
LIG-ETHICS INVESTIGATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3389&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3389.htm |