IL SB3386 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. In provisions setting forth circumstances under which the court lacks jurisdiction to proceed on a petition for the appointment of a guardian of a minor, adds language permitting a petition if the parent or parents voluntarily relinquished physical custody of the minor, revises language permitting a petition if the parent or parents consent to the appointment, and makes other changes. Provides that upon the filing of a petition by a minor's living, adoptive, or adjudicated parent whose parental rights have not been terminated, the court shall discharge the guardian and terminate the guardianship if the parent establishes, by a preponderance of the evidence, that a material change in the circumstances of the minor or the parent has occurred since the guardian's appointment unless the guardian establishes, by clear and convincing evidence, that termination of the guardianship would not be in the best interests of the minor. Sets forth factors to be considered by the court in determining the minor's best interests. Repeals provisions concerning the parental right to custody.
Title
PROBATE-GUARDIAN-PARENT RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1338 | |
2010-07-27 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2010-03-15 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |