IL SB3323 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uniform State Tax Lien Registration Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall establish and maintain a public database known as the Uniform State Tax Lien Registry. Provides that, if any person neglects or refuses to pay any final tax liability, the Department of Revenue may file in the registry a notice of tax lien within 3 years from the date of the final tax liability. Provides that the tax lien is perfected upon inclusion in the registry and shall be attached to all of the existing and after-acquired property of the debtor. Provides that the Department of Revenue may impose filing fees and fees to release the lien. Provides that the Department of Revenue may sell at bulk the information appearing on the tax lien registry; however, that information may not be used by any party for survey, marketing, or solicitation purposes. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tax Act, and the Title Insurance Act to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
STATE TAX LIEN REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 5b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 5c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 1102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 1105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 520 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 520 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 520 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |