IL SB3315 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Changes definitions of "population" to be the total number of inhabitants according to the last preceding federal decennial census (rather than number of inhabitants or number of persons). Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Adds a definition of "population" in the general definition Section.
Title
MUNI CD & COUNTY CD-POPULATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-003-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 2-3001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3315&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3315.htm |