IL SB3290 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Changes the heading of Article V-F to the Nursing Home Residents' Managed Care Rights Law (rather than the Medicare-Medicaid Alignment Initiative (MMAI) Nursing Home Residents' Managed Care Rights Law). Expands the scope of the Article to apply to policies and contracts for the nursing home component of any Medicaid managed care program established by statute, rule, or contract, including, but not limited to, the Medicare-Medicaid Alignment Initiative Program, the Integrated Care Program, the HealthChoices Program, the Managed Long-Term Services and Support Program, and any and all successor programs. Grants the Department of Healthcare and Family Services rulemaking authority to implement this provision. Makes changes to the definitions for "enrollee", "managed care organization", and "transition period". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-NURSING HOME RESIDENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-02-28SenateRe-referred to Public Health
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555F-1Amended CodeCitation Text
30555F-10Amended CodeCitation Text
30555F-15Amended CodeCitation Text
30555F-2.5New CodeSee Bill Text
3055Art. V-F headingAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback