IL SB3290 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Changes the heading of Article V-F to the Nursing Home Residents' Managed Care Rights Law (rather than the Medicare-Medicaid Alignment Initiative (MMAI) Nursing Home Residents' Managed Care Rights Law). Expands the scope of the Article to apply to policies and contracts for the nursing home component of any Medicaid managed care program established by statute, rule, or contract, including, but not limited to, the Medicare-Medicaid Alignment Initiative Program, the Integrated Care Program, the HealthChoices Program, the Managed Long-Term Services and Support Program, and any and all successor programs. Grants the Department of Healthcare and Family Services rulemaking authority to implement this provision. Makes changes to the definitions for "enrollee", "managed care organization", and "transition period". Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-NURSING HOME RESIDENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1085 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-18 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Public Health |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5F-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5F-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5F-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5F-2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | Art. V-F heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |