IL SB3288 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0928
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0928
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law and the State Finance Act. Exempts payments under plans of the Department of Central Management Services for certain liability and indemnification claims and final judgment settlements from the prohibition against expenditure in a fiscal year of moneys appropriated in an earlier fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
ST FINANCE-FISCAL YEAR LIMIT
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0928 | |
2010-06-15 | Effective Date June 15, 2010 | |
2010-06-15 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-042-000 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |