IL SB3256 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0963
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0963
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to, within 365 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act, establish procedures to permit ID/DD facilities licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act to submit monthly billing claims for reimbursement purposes. Provides that following development of these procedures, the Department shall have an additional 365 days to test the viability of the new system and to ensure that any necessary operational or structural changes to its information technology platforms are implemented. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-ID/DD-BILLING CLAIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0963 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |