IL SB3214 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Pollinator Friendly Solar Site Act. Provides that an owner of a ground-mounted solar site may follow practices that: (1) provide native perennial vegetation and foraging habitat which is beneficial to game birds, songbirds, and pollinators; and (2) reduce storm water runoff and erosion at the solar site. Provides that an owner or manager of a solar site with a generating capacity of more than 40 kilowatts implementing site management practices under the Act may claim that the site is "pollinator-friendly" or provides benefits to game birds, songbirds, and pollinators only if the site adheres to guidance set forth by the pollinator friendly scorecard published by the Department of Natural Resources in consultation with stakeholders. Provides that an owner making a beneficial habitat claim shall make the solar site's pollinator score card, and where available, related vegetation management plans, available to the public and provide a copy to the Department of Natural Resources and a nonprofit solar industry trade association of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
SOLAR SITE-POLLINATOR FRIENDLY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1022 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |