IL SB3149 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public Self-Care of Diabetes Act. Provides that a person with diabetes, or parent or legal guardian of a person with diabetes, may self-administer insulin or administer insulin for his or her child in any location, public or private, where the person or their parent or legal guardian are authorized to be, irrespective of whether the injection site is uncovered during or incidental to the administration of insulin. Effective immediately.
Title
INSULIN SELF-ADMINISTRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0844 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Effective Date August 1, 2014 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-07 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |