IL SB3142 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Department of Returning Resident Affairs Act (which may be referred to as the Second Chance State Act) and amends the Freedom of Information Act, the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Contains declarations and findings. Creates the Department of Returning Resident Affairs Act. Sets forth the powers of the Department in relation to formerly incarcerated or detained individuals and other matters. Provides that the Department shall develop and administer the Second Chance State Program and specifies the establishment of hub sites to serve eligible individuals and other elements of the Program. Creates the Second Chance State Transportation Task Force to create a program to provide no-cost or low-cost transportation options for returning residents before or after their release from incarceration. Creates the Returning Residents Interagency Council to identify the manner in which State officials and agencies can designate, allocate, and coordinate the use of their resources to best support the needs of returning residents. Provides for the appointment of (i) a Director of Returning Resident Affairs who has experience working with or for a community-based organization and was incarcerated in an Illinois Department of Corrections facility for not less than one year and (ii) an Assistant Director and a General Counsel, and provides that these appointees shall serve for a 7-year period and shall be subject to removal only upon a finding of misconduct by the Executive Inspector General for the agencies of the Illinois Governor. Contains provisions regarding other matters. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Effective immediately.
Title
DPT RETURNING RESIDENT AFFAIRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Appropriations- Criminal Justice |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-172 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-240 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3142&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3142.htm |