IL SB3122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall issue a report by June 30, 2019 to the Governor and the General Assembly evaluating the degree to which tax exemptions and incentives offered under the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Electricity Excise Tax Law spur job growth and economic development. Directs the Department of Revenue to provide such information as the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may request. Repeals the Section on June 30, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-TAX EXEMPTION STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1025New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback