IL SB3122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall issue a report by June 30, 2019 to the Governor and the General Assembly evaluating the degree to which tax exemptions and incentives offered under the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Electricity Excise Tax Law spur job growth and economic development. Directs the Department of Revenue to provide such information as the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may request. Repeals the Section on June 30, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-TAX EXEMPTION STUDY
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3122&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3122.htm |