IL SB3114 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that the Director of the Division of Financial Institutions of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may accept an examination of a credit union made by the credit union's share insurer as an alternative to the biennial examination of a credit union conducted by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation or a public accountant registered by the Department.
Title
CREDIT UNION ACT-BIENNIAL EXAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3114&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3114.htm |