IL SB3109 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall allow an applicant to provide his or her individual taxpayer identification number as an alternative to provide a social security number when applying for a license. Provides that no applicant shall be denied a license solely based on his or her immigration status or citizenship status. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Removes language providing that an applicant for a registered pharmacist license shall provide evidence indicating that he or she is a United States citizen or legally admitted alien.
Title
DFPR LICENSE-IMMIGRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1078 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-010-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-049-001 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-003-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-009-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2105 | 2105-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2105 | 2105-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |