IL SB3100 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from requiring an employee to sign a nondisclosure agreement regarding the employee's salary, from seeking the salary history of a prospective employee, and from requiring that a prospective employee's salary history meet any specified criteria. Provides for employers to establish a self-evaluation plan of the employer's pay practices. Sets forth permissible components of a self-evaluation plan. Requires the self-evaluation plan to be submitted to the Department of Labor for verification. Provides that an employer that has completed a self-evaluation plan that has been verified by the Department of Labor has an affirmative defense to liability for certain alleged violations of the Act. Provides that an employer that does not have a verified self-evaluation plan may be subject to civil penalties for violations of the Act.
Title
EQUAL PAY-SALARY HISTORY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 013-001-002 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 007-005-006 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Labor |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 112 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 112 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |