IL SB3080 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall by rule establish a comprehensive low-income water assistance policy and program. Contains various provisions concerning the policy and program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Adds requirements related to billing statements and reconnection of service for water and sewer utilities. Provides that upon request by a water utility, the Illinois Commerce Commission may allow, but may not require, a water utility to establish a customer assistance program. Provides that an entity subject to certain federal laws that serves or provides water or sewer services to a specified number of people shall conduct a cost of service study every 5 years. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that within one year of the effective date of the amendatory Act, every community water system shall create a plan to remove all known lead service lines within 10 years from the completion of the plan. Requires each community water system to implement an asset management plan designed to inspect, maintain, repair, and renew its infrastructure within 18 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt rules for lead replacement that require an expedited timeline for high risk facilities and communities within 18 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Creates the Statewide Advisory Council on Lead in Drinking Water and requires specified community water supplies to create water system advisory councils tasked with various duties related to lead in drinking water awareness. Makes other changes.
Title
DCEO-UTILITIES-IDPH-EPA-WATER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-001-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-870 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 8-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 17.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 17.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |