IL SB2992 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that during a declared harvest season emergency, the Governor may waive a vehicle's registered weight limitation and set a divisible load weight limit not to exceed 10% of a vehicle's registered gross weight, provided that the vehicle's axle weight and gross weight do not both exceed 10% above the statutorily required maximum limits. Provides that local authorities may waive special permit requirements during harvest season emergencies, and set a divisible load weight limit not to exceed 10% of a vehicle's registered gross weight, provided that the vehicle's axle weight and gross weight do not both exceed 10% above the statutorily required maximum limits. Provides that the Governor's emergency harvest permit exemption and local authority permit exemptions shall apply to all registered vehicles, including vehicles used in private or for-hire movement of divisible load agricultural commodities in use during the declared time period. Provides that provisions concerning the Governor's emergency harvest permit exemption and local authority permit exemptions shall not apply to municipalities with a population of 2,000,000 or more inhabitants. Makes conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-EXCESS WEIGHT AG EXEMPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |