IL SB2951 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Early Mental Health and Addictions Treatment Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and other specified agencies and entities, to develop a pilot program under which a qualifying adolescent or young adult may receive community-based mental health treatment from a youth-focused community support team for early treatment that is specifically tailored to the needs of youth and young adults in the early stages of a serious emotional disturbance or serious mental illness. Requires the Department to apply, no later than September 30, 2019, for any necessary federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program. Requires the Department to implement the pilot program no later than December 31, 2019 if federal approval is not necessary. Contains provisions concerning the creation of a community-based treatment model under the pilot program; the development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Requires the Department to develop an Assertive Engagement and Community-Based Clinical Treatment Pilot Program for individuals with opioid and other drug addictions. Contains provisions on in-office, in-home, and in-community services provided under the pilot program; application for a federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program; development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Effective immediately.
Title
EARLY MENTAL HEALTH ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1016 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-009-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-16 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-09 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-001-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |