IL SB2951 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Early Mental Health and Addictions Treatment Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and other specified agencies and entities, to develop a pilot program under which a qualifying adolescent or young adult may receive community-based mental health treatment from a youth-focused community support team for early treatment that is specifically tailored to the needs of youth and young adults in the early stages of a serious emotional disturbance or serious mental illness. Requires the Department to apply, no later than September 30, 2019, for any necessary federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program. Requires the Department to implement the pilot program no later than December 31, 2019 if federal approval is not necessary. Contains provisions concerning the creation of a community-based treatment model under the pilot program; the development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Requires the Department to develop an Assertive Engagement and Community-Based Clinical Treatment Pilot Program for individuals with opioid and other drug addictions. Contains provisions on in-office, in-home, and in-community services provided under the pilot program; application for a federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program; development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY MENTAL HEALTH ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-001-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback