IL SB2932 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Green Buildings Act. Provides that the Capital Development Board may: (1) annually conduct energy efficiency audits of State-owned real property; (2) annually rank State-owned real properties according to their energy efficiency; and (3) encourage energy efficiency audits of State-owned real properties based on those rankings. Provides that State agencies may elect to conduct energy efficiency audits of State-owned real property and may retain the amount of savings realized from energy improvements and conservation measures, subject to certain limitations.
Title
CDB-ENERGY EFFICIENT AUDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-11-16 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2016-11-16 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-11-16 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-15 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 069-046-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |