IL SB2931 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits aggravated assault when, in committing an assault, he or she knows the individual assaulted to be a judge of election: (i) performing his or her official duties; (ii) assaulted to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (iii) assaulted in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that the penalty is a Class 4 felony. Provides that a person commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a judge of election: (i) performing his or her official duties; (ii) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (iii) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that the penalty is a Class 3 felony.
Title
AGG ASSAULT&BAT-ELECTION JUDGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |