IL SB2931 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Military Code of Illinois. Changes the required grade for the position of Adjutant General from Major General to Lieutenant General. Provides that the Adjutant General shall serve as both the Director of the Department of Military Affairs and as the Commander of the Illinois National Guard; makes a conforming change. In the Section concerning the Department of Military Affairs' power to make grants from the Illinois Military Family Relief Fund, provides that the Department has the power to make grants to (1) members of the Illinois National Guard or Illinois residents who are members of the reserves of the armed forces of the United States who have been called to active duty as a result of an emergency declared by the President or Congress or as defined by administrative rule of the Department (rather than as a result of the September 11, 2001 terrorist attacks) and (2) members of the Illinois National Guard who have been called to State Active Duty for 30 or more consecutive days of duty; makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MILITARY CODE-DIRECTOR-GRANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1805 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 22-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |