IL SB2899 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2022, targeted dental services that are provided to adults and children under the medical assistance program shall be established and paid at no less than the rates published by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and effective January 1, 2020 for all local health departments as the fee schedule for children and adult recipients. Sets forth the reimbursement rates for certain anesthesia services.
Title
MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2899&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2899.htm |