IL SB2864 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Structural Pest Control Act from December 31, 2019 to December 31, 2023. Amends the Structural Pest Control Act. Requires individuals applying general use or restricted pesticides for commercial structural pest control or restricted pesticides for non-commercial structural pest control to engage in or complete training requirements prescribed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Requires an individual engaging in commercial structural pest control and utilizing general use pesticides to be 18 years old. Requires an individual engaging in commercial or non-commercial structural pest control and supervising the use of certain restricted pesticides to be 18 years old. Provides that the Department may suspend, revoke, or refuse to issue or renew a certificate, registration, or license of an individual that fails to pay a civil penalty or fine assessed by the Department. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEST CONTROL-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0716 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 235 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 235 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 235 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 235 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 235 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |