IL SB2835 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Permits currently employed and retired State correctional officers to carry their own firearms off duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] |
Sen. Christine Johnson [R] | Sen. Christine Radogno [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2835&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2835.htm |