IL SB2807 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that any minor 15 years of age or older arrested or taken into custody under the Act for aggravated vehicular hijacking shall be detained in an authorized detention facility until a detention or shelter care hearing is held to determine if there is probable cause to believe that the minor is a delinquent minor and: (1) secure custody is a matter of immediate and urgent necessity for the protection of the minor or of the person or property of another; (2) the minor is likely to flee the jurisdiction of the court; or (3) the minor was taken into custody under a warrant. Provides that if the court makes that determination, the minor shall continue to be held until the disposition of an adjudicatory hearing under the Delinquent Minors Article of the Act.
Title
JUV CT-VEH&AGG VEH HIJACKING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2807&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2807.htm |