IL SB2803 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations from the Pension Stabilization Fund for financing the unfunded liabilities of the General Assembly Retirement System, the Judges Retirement System of Illinois, the State Employees’ Retirement System of Illinois, the Teachers’ Retirement System of the State of Illinois, and the State Universities Retirement System. Makes supplemental appropriations from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Central Management Services for group insurance. Appropriates $2,700,000,000 from the State Coronavirus Urgent Remediation Emergency Fund to the Department of Employment Security for payment to the Illinois Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund for partial repayment of Title XII advances, including prior year costs. Appropriates $250,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to deposit into the Illinois Prepaid Tuition Trust Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
$GOVERNOR
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0696 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Effective Date March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-03-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 039-016-000 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-043-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-005-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-03-15 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-015-000 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations; 008-004-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |