IL SB2768 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies provisions concerning the College Savings Pool. Provides that the State Treasurer, in administering the College Savings Pool, may, among other actions, perform any other action he or she deems necessary to administer the Pool. Provides that the State Treasurer may delegate duties related to the College Savings Pool to one or more contractors. Provides that any fees, costs, and expenses related to the College Savings Pool shall be paid from the assets of the College Savings Pool. Provides further requirements concerning fees of the College Savings Pool. Modifies provisions concerning investment restrictions, distributions, and contributions of the College Savings Pool. Removes provisions requiring the maintenance of specified records. Modifies defined terms. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2768&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2768.htm |