IL SB2753 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Board of Education Article of the School Code. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the State Board of Education shall provide stipends for teachers who participate in externships with a manufacturing company in this State.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER EXTERNSHIP-PAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2753&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2753.htm |