IL SB2661 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Cook County Board of Review Redistricting Act of 2021. Provides legislative findings. Redistricts Cook County for election of Cook County Board of Review Commissioners. Repeals the Cook County Board of Review Districts Act and the Cook County Board of Review Districts Act of 2001. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that in 2021 and any year following the federal decennial census in which the results of the census are not available by March 31, the General Assembly may use other population data, including, but not limited to, the most recent American Community Survey 5-year data, to reapportion board of review districts. Effective immediately.
Title
HLTH CARE PROF-LICENSE-EXTEND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0012 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Effective Date June 4, 2021 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-018-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-045-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Redistricting Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Redistricting Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; D. Turner |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 70 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |