IL SB2661 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Allows an elementary school district with a student population of no more than 200 to enter into an intergovernmental agreement with an elementary school district with a student population of at least 5,200 for the delivery of any or all special education services if the 2 elementary districts have an adjacent boundary. Sets forth employment and reimbursement provisions and what the agreement must include. Provides that no more than 2 school districts may be a party to such an agreement at any one time, and no school district may have in effect at any one time more than one such agreement. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-INTERGOV AGR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2661&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2661.htm |