IL SB2637 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2027, a person or entity shall not manufacture, sell, deliver, distribute, hold, or offer for sale a food product for human consumption that contains brominated vegetable oil, potassium bromate, propylparaben, or red dye 3. Provides that a person or entity that violates the prohibition shall be liable for a civil penalty not to exceed $5,000 for a first violation and not to exceed $10,000 for each subsequent violation. Makes a conforming change.
Title
PROHIBITED FOOD ADDITIVES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-30 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-001-000 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-003-000 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-11-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 620 | 13.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 620 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |