IL SB2573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Telecommunications Article.
Title
AUTODIALER-CALLER ID-CONSENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |