IL SB2573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Telecommunications Article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTODIALER-CALLER ID-CONSENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220513-100Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2573&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2573ham005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2573_04242018_052000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback