IL SB2544 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act and the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a monthly transfer shall be made to the Local Government Distributive Fund an amount certified by the Department of Revenue equal to: (1) the amount that would have been distributed under the State Revenue Sharing Act to all financially distressed cities if a sum calculated using 10% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed by the Illinois Income Tax Act upon individuals, trusts, estates, and corporations during the preceding month had been transferred to the Local Government Distributive Fund; and (2) subtracting the amount distributed to all financially distressed cities from the Local Government Distributive Fund under the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides for continuing appropriation if insufficient appropriations are made. Amends the Financially Distressed City Law of the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes the law applicable to both home rule and non-home rule municipalities. Provides that a State agency or unit of local government may also render technical assistance to a municipality's Financial Advisory Authority as the Authority may request. Provides that the State shall not reduce revenues or impose additional costs affecting a financially distressed city affecting the municipality unless it is consistent with the Financial Plan and Budget in effect. Provides that State mandates enacted while a municipality is designated as a financially distressed city that would cause the municipality to incur costs are not valid or enforceable during the period when the municipality is under the financially distressed city designation. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
FINANCIALLY DISTRESSED CITIES
Sponsors
Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RE) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-12-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-12-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-12-24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-12-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2544&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2544.htm |