IL SB2541 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0983
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0983
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Act. Provides for the registration of volunteer health practitioners with a registration system for the provision of health or veterinary services in the State for a host entity or disaster relief organization while an emergency declaration is in effect. Sets forth a provision concerning the uniformity of application and construction of the Act. Provides for the creation of the registration system. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency shall be the administrating authority of the Uniform Act.
Title
UNIFORM EMER VOLUNTR HLTH PRAC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0983 | |
2010-07-02 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-02 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-03-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 044-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 010-000-000 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-02-24 | Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2010-02-17 | Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |