IL SB2540 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that payments made pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement to an individual as vacation pay, vacation pay allowance, pay in lieu of vacation, or as standby pay during a period of shutdown for the taking of inventory or for vacation purposes shall be deemed "wages". Makes changes concerning what constitutes "disqualifying income".
Title
UNEMPLOY INS-VACATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State Government Operations |
2012-04-18 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | To Labor Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-12-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-12-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2540&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2540.htm |