IL SB2527 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0792
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0792
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Prohibits a school board from limiting the number of dual credit courses a student may enroll in or the number of credits a student may receive from dual credit courses. Provides that if a school district establishes an online learning program for students (with exceptions), the school board may not limit (i) which students may participate in the program, (ii) the number of online courses a student may enroll in, or (iii) the number of credits a student may receive from online courses.
Title
SCH CD-DUAL CREDIT-ONLINE
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0792 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |