IL SB2494 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is a Class 4 felony for a child sex offender to knowingly reside within 500 feet of a public or private park where persons under the age of 18 regularly gather. Defines "private park".
Title
CRIM CD-CHILD SEX OFFENDER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |