IL SB2494 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall issue Gold Star license plates to all siblings of a person who has lost his or her life while serving in the Armed Forces (instead of to only one surviving sibling in the absence of a surviving parent).
Title
VEH CD-GOLD STAR SPECIAL PLATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0723 |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-004 |
2012-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2012-05-15 | House | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed |
2012-05-15 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-05-11 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-05-11 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012 |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-02-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-000-000 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 9, 2012 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2012 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |