IL SB2482 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Includes General Election Day, General Primary Election Day, Consolidated Election Day, and Consolidated Primary Election Day as State holidays. Makes conforming changes in the Illinois Procurement Code, the School Code, and the State Universities Civil Service Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-ELECTION HOLIDAYS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 70 | 45a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2482&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2482.htm |