IL SB2482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a bus that meets certain requirements for school buses under the Code may be used to transport persons 18 years of age or less (rather than used to transport persons 18 years of age or less in connection with a licensed youth camp or licensed child care facility).
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL BUS-TRANSPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0791 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-806a | Amended Code | Citation Text |